Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 836 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6236 Week
» 24288 Month
» 257208 Year
» 1922584 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1308 m/e 06/1906
British Railways 31308 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Sun 23/12/1962
Service Life 56 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1906
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75A   Brighton 6w/e 14/06/1959
73J   Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 28/05/1962
     Withdrawn on 23/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 28/05/1962
WDN   on 23/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/12/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1308
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31308    
30/12/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
23/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31308    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev