Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 125 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3638 Week
» 23931 Month
» 201835 Year
» 1867211 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1309 m/e 06/1906
British Railways 31309 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal During 06/1955
Service Life 49 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1906
FAV   Faversham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STL   St Leonards 4w/e 12/03/1949
75B   Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STL St Leonards 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 05/02/1951
TOSTORE 75B Redhill 8w/e 13/05/1954
REINS 75B Redhill 4w/e 11/12/1954
WDN   w/e 21/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1309
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (STL)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31309    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
1955 Scrapped Scrapped    
06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31309    

prev prev