Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1309 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
British Railways |
31309 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1906 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1955 |
Service Life |
49 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1906 |
FAV |
|
Faversham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STL |
|
St Leonards |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
75B |
|
Redhill |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STL |
St Leonards |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
74B |
Ramsgate |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
TOSTORE |
75B |
Redhill |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/05/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. |
SLS/194708 |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1309 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31309 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31309 |
|
|