Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 175 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3688 Week
» 23981 Month
» 201885 Year
» 1867261 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1310 m/e 06/1906
British Railways 31310 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal During 05/1960
Service Life 53 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1906
FAV   Faversham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STL   St Leonards 4w/e 12/03/1949
75B   Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951
75A   Brighton 4w/e 01/10/1953
74B   Ramsgate 6w/e 21/06/1955
74A   Ashford 4w/e 10/10/1955
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 15/06/1956
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STL St Leonards 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 04/06/1955
TOSTORE 74B Ramsgate 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 74A Ashford 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 04/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/10/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1310
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (STL)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31310    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
01/10/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31310    
06/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev