Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14173 Week
» 67189 Month
» 186716 Year
» 3213569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1317 |
m/e |
03/1908 |
British Railways |
31317 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/02/1962 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
74C |
Dover Marine |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
q/e |
11/06/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1317 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31317 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31317 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|