Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1704 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19507 Week
» 72523 Month
» 192050 Year
» 3218903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1319 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
British Railways |
31319 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/01/1960 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 2 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
74E |
St Leonards |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
04/06/1955 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
74A |
Ashford |
9w/e |
10/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
73J |
Tonbridge |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1950 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. |
SLS/194708 |
30/06/1950 |
General |
Three I.1X locomotives have recently been transferred from Bognor to New Cross Gate, namely 2002, 2008, 2596. 'H' tanks Nos. 1158 an 1319 are being fitted for pull-and-push working. 'D.3' 32365, of air attack fame, originally Victoria, has been repaired at Ashford. Several 'B.4X' ex store were working at the end of June, in readiness for use if required on Farnborough Air Pageant Specials; for these the E.R. (G.E. Section) lent a number of Westinghouse-fitted trains as traffic was expected to be heavy. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1319 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31319 |
|
|
09/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
24/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
20/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31319 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|