Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 802 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 24254 Month
» 257174 Year
» 1922550 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1320 m/e 05/1907
British Railways 31320 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/12/1955
Service Life 48 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1956

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1907
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/04/1951
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 13/04/1951
75A   Brighton 4w/e 29/10/1953
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 3w/e 09/05/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 17/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 75A Brighton 6w/e 18/11/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 3w/e 09/05/1955
WDN   w/e 17/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/10/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1320
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31320    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
29/10/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
29/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
09/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
17/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31320    
1956 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev