|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1946 | Loanees returned | 1325/73 have been returned ex loan to the Betteshanger Colliery and the E.K.R. respectively. | SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 | County Names | Locomotives of the '1000' class are being named after English and Welsh counties, a straight nameplate being fixed along the single splasher. No. 1000 is named 'County of Middlesex.' Twenty-nine other locomotives of the class are being named after the following counties: Bucks, Berks, Wilts, Oxford, Somerset, Devon, Cornwall, Dorset, Brecknock, Cardigan, Carmarthen, Carnarvon, Cheshire, Denbigh, Glamorgan, Merioneth, Monmouth, Gloucester, Hereford, Leicester, Northampton, Hants, Montgomery, Pembroke, Radnor, Salop, Stafford, Warwick, and Worcester. This revives the 'County' class outside cylinder 4-4-0 naming of years ago. Incidentally the naming of 'Halls' has been resumed. | SLS/194605 |
26/03/1946 | Surbiton | 903 (STL) painted green was noted on the 5.37 p.m. ex Basingstoke on 26/3. | SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 | Loanees returned | 1325/73 have been returned ex loan to the Betteshanger Colliery and the E.K.R. respectively. | SLS/194605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1910 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1325 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) | ||
01/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) | ||
01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31325 | ||
26/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
12/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
13/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
19/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31325 |