Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14304 Week
» 67320 Month
» 186847 Year
» 3213700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1326 |
m/e |
12/1906 |
British Railways |
31326 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1906 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1961 |
Service Life |
54 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73E |
Faversham |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
74B |
Ramsgate |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
14/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
73H |
Dover Marine |
5w/e |
19/08/1959 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
5w/e |
08/07/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1326 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31326 |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
19/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31326 |
|
|
11/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|