Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 901 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18704 Week
» 71720 Month
» 191247 Year
» 3218100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1327 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
British Railways |
31327 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/11/1959 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1953 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1327 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31327 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
08/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31327 |
|
|