Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 55 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4970 Week
» 16207 Month
» 249127 Year
» 1914503 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1404 m/e 10/1932
British Railways 31404 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/12/1963
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1932
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73J   Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
72B   Salisbury 3w/e 26/05/1961
70C   Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 01/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1932 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1404
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31404    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31404    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev