Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 194 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3226 Week
» 21278 Month
» 254198 Year
» 1919574 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1406 m/e 01/1933
British Railways 31406 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1933
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1933
RED   Redhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/06/1948
AFD   Ashford 5w/e 04/02/1950
73C   Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953
74A   Ashford 8w/e 20/07/1953
73J   Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
71G   Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/03/1962
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC AFD Ashford 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 74A Ashford 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 05/03/1962
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1933 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1406
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
01/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31406    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (AFD)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
05/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31406    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev