Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 132 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5663 Week
» 30497 Month
» 64829 Year
» 1730205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1409 m/e 10/1933
British Railways 31409 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1933
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 04/02/1950
73F   Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959
72A   Exmouth Junction m/e 09/11/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 73F Ashford P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1933 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1409
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31409    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31409    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev