Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 112 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3625 Week
» 23918 Month
» 201822 Year
» 1867198 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1410 m/e 11/1933
British Railways 31410 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/11/1964
Service Life 31 yrs , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1933
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75C   Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
75B   Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 01/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 01/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1933 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1410
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31410    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31410    
03/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev