Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 42 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17845 Week
» 70861 Month
» 190388 Year
» 3217241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1410 |
m/e |
11/1933 |
British Railways |
31410 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1933 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 01/11/1964 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
29/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1410 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31410 |
|
|
22/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
01/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31410 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|