Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5654 Week
» 30488 Month
» 64820 Year
» 1730196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1412 m/e 12/1933
British Railways 31412 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/08/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1933
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75C   Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
75B   Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 09/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 09/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1933 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1412
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31412    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31412    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev