Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 753 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6153 Week
» 24205 Month
» 257125 Year
» 1922501 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1470 m/e 08/1906
British Railways 31470 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1906
Withdrawal During 06/1959
Service Life 52 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1906
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E   Faversham 4w/e 01/10/1953
74D   Tonbridge 7w/e 19/12/1955
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine m/e 30/06/1947
TOSTORE DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC 73E Faversham 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 7w/e 19/12/1955
WDN   w/e 04/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/06/1951 Brighton Works On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1470
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31470    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
19/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31470    
09/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev