Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 163 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3676 Week
» 23969 Month
» 201873 Year
» 1867249 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1477 m/e 03/1907
British Railways 31477 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal During 02/1951
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1907
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 27/01/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Ashford Works During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. SLS/194705
10/05/1951 Dover Harbour Early in May, the neatly dissected parts of the following SR locos could be seen in a heap at the eastern end of the Harbour: (3)1157/443, 31275, 31477, 32402. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1477
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31477    
02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31477    
04/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev