Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2151 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19954 Week
» 72970 Month
» 192497 Year
» 3219350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1494 |
m/e |
04/1903 |
British Railways |
31494 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 04/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1960 |
Service Life |
57 yrs , 4 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
04/11/1951 |
Ashford Works |
31523 was recently seen being pulled to pieces, even crank axles and cylinders being cut up. It was with some surprise, therefore, that 31523 emerges, yesterday, resplendent in lined black. We have been informed that she has a spare set of frames (from 1547?) and new cylinders cast at Ashford. 31735, which has been in the shed for six months, is now in the works for new cylinders, and 31505 an 31494, which have been outside the works for the whole year, have also gone in for similar attention. |
SLS/195201 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1494 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31494 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31494 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|