Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 236 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3268 Week
» 21320 Month
» 254240 Year
» 1919616 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1497 m/e 09/1907
British Railways 31497 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/10/1960
Service Life 53 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1907
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 30/06/1949
73B   Bricklayers Arms (Reinstated) 4w/e 17/06/1950
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/12/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
72B   Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
72B   Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/05/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 22/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 30/06/1949
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 06/05/1960
WDN   w/e 22/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1497
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31497    
17/06/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
06/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
22/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31497    
11/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev