Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1193 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18996 Week
» 72012 Month
» 191539 Year
» 3218392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1501 |
m/e |
04/1903 |
British Railways |
31501 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
Coppernobs |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 04/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1953 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1501 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31501 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
05/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31501 |
|
|
05/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|