Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 243 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3275 Week
» 21327 Month
» 254247 Year
» 1919623 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1504 m/e 12/1905
British Railways 31504 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/02/1958
Service Life 52 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1905
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 3w/e 28/05/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 15/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 3w/e 28/05/1949
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 13/06/1955
WDN   w/e 15/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1504
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31504    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
15/02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 31504    
03/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev