Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 198 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3230 Week
» 21282 Month
» 254202 Year
» 1919578 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1506 m/e 12/1905
British Railways 31506 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal During 09/1958
Service Life 52 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1905
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 30/11/1946
TOSTORE BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1948
WDN   2w/e 13/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1506
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31506    
09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 31506    
10/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev