Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 885 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18688 Week
» 71704 Month
» 191231 Year
» 3218084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1507 |
m/e |
09/1908 |
British Railways |
31507 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
E1A |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 09/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1961 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/12/1948 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. |
SLS/194901 |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1507 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31507 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31507 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|