Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 244 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3276 Week
» 21328 Month
» 254248 Year
» 1919624 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1511 m/e 12/1905
British Railways 31511 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal Sat 30/12/1950
Service Life 45 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1905
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 30/06/1949
74A   Ashford 4w/e 08/12/1950
     Withdrawn on 30/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 30/06/1949
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/06/1950
WDN   on 30/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
01/03/1951 Dover Scrapyard Certain withdrawn locomotives have recently been scrapped at Dover in a yard belonging to Dover Industries Ltd. This yard is adjacent to the eastern arm of Dover harbour, and is easily visible from a public footpath up the cliffs nearby. Engines are towed there along the sea front, and the track along this route has been relaid and set in concrete. A 'P' class 0-6-0T is used for motive power, though it is rumoured that diesels may be used later. No. 31511 is said to have been cut up here in February, but confirmation is required. On 1st March 1951, the only thing visible in the yard which could be identified as part of a locomotive was a bunker with the number 31546 (from an 'H' class 0-4-4T) and this was being cut up by oxy-acetylene equipment. The 0-4-2T No. 2359, still outside Dover shed, is used as a stationary boiler. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1511
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31511    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
30/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 31511    
02/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev