Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17417 Week
» 70433 Month
» 189960 Year
» 3216813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1545 |
m/e |
09/1906 |
British Railways |
31545 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 09/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/03/1961 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1947 |
Victoria Station |
S.E. & C. 4-4-O's of various classes, including Nos. 1515, 1545, and 1760 have been noted piloting 'H2' No. 2423 on Victoria-Newhaven boat trains which have not been loaded above the recent 4-4-2 capacity, but it was probably on account of the service slacks due to landslides and track repairs following the severe weather. |
SLS/194706 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1545 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31545 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31545 |
|
|
05/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|