Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3037 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16443 Week
» 69459 Month
» 188986 Year
» 3215839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1551 |
m/e |
01/1905 |
British Railways |
31551 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 01/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
59 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1551 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31551 |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
10/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
30/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31551 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|