Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 713 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6113 Week
» 24165 Month
» 257085 Year
» 1922461 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1576 m/e 05/1903
British Railways 31576 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/11/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1903
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 08/10/1957
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 07/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 07/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1576
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31576    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
11/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
07/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31576    

prev prev