Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 208 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3240 Week
» 21292 Month
» 254212 Year
» 1919588 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1579 m/e 10/1903
British Railways 31579 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 58 yrs , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1903
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 08/10/1957
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 10/03/1960
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
73A   Stewarts Lane 8w/e 17/01/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 17/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1579
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31579    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31579    

prev prev