Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2737 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16143 Week
» 69159 Month
» 188686 Year
» 3215539 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1579 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
British Railways |
31579 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 10/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1579 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31579 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
17/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31579 |
|
|