Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 125 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3638 Week
» 23931 Month
» 201835 Year
» 1867211 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1586 m/e 02/1907
British Railways 31586 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1907
Withdrawal During 09/1955
Service Life 48 yrs , 7 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1907
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 08/12/1950
73E   Faversham 4w/e 05/02/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 27/06/1951
75B   Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951
70E   Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 26/05/1953
70C   Guildford 8w/e 13/05/1954
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE TON Tonbridge 9w/e 01/08/1948
TOSTORE 74D Tonbridge m/e 31/08/1950
REINS 73E Faversham 6w/e 14/03/1951
REINS 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951
TOSTORE 75B Redhill 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 75B Redhill w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70E Reading (S.R.) 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 8w/e 13/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1951 Misnumbered \"D\" One of the class D engines, No. 31586 has been running on the Reading line with its own number on the front buffer, beam and a plate with 31591 on the smokebox door! SLS/195201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1586
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31586    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
1955 Scrapped Scrapped    
09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31586    

prev prev