|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1947 | Ashford Works | Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. | SLS/194706 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1907 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1587 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) | ||
02/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (RED) | ||
03/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31587 | ||
1951 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
28/07/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31587 |