Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 199 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3231 Week
» 21283 Month
» 254203 Year
» 1919579 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1591 m/e 03/1907
British Railways 31591 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal During 06/1955
Service Life 48 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1907
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 08/12/1950
73E   Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951
75B   Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951
75E   Three Bridges 4w/e 08/02/1954
75B   Redhill 4w/e 11/12/1954
75E   Three Bridges 9w/e 08/02/1955
70C   Guildford 5w/e 11/03/1955
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 73E Faversham 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951
TOSTORE 75B Redhill 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 75B Redhill w/e 06/12/1951
REINS 75B Redhill m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 75B Redhill 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
TOSTORE 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 08/02/1954
REINS 75B Redhill 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 75E Three Bridges 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 70C Guildford 4w/e 11/03/1955
WDN   w/e 21/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/02/1948 Brighton Station Unusual visitors to Brighton on 9/2 were Nos. 1918/20; 'W' tanks are not often seen there. Some half-dozen Eastern Section engines appear during the course of a week, especially on the through train from Sevenoaks due 8.24 a.m. (frequently an 'H' tank) and on the through from Tonbridge due 9.10 a.m. on which 'D' and 'Dl' classes appear (Nos. 1591, 1731, 1745, etc.). Otherwise the steam working is in the hands of the usual Central Section engines apart from Standard classes built since 1922, such as 'V,' 'N,' 'Ul,' and the two 'P' class tanks which are used for Kingston Wharf and shed coal stage duties SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1591
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31591    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
1955 Scrapped Scrapped    
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31591    

prev prev