Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1698 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19501 Week
» 72517 Month
» 192044 Year
» 3218897 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1619 |
m/e |
12/1928 |
British Railways |
31619 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 19/12/1965 |
Service Life |
37 yrs , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) |
In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1619 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31619 |
|
|
12/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
19/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31619 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: at Eastleigh Depot |
|
|