|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/07/1961 | Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; | SLS/196109 |
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1928 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1621 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31621 | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) | ||
06/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
01/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
21/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31621 | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |