Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2298 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20101 Week
» 73117 Month
» 192644 Year
» 3219497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1622 |
m/e |
01/1929 |
British Railways |
31622 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 01/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
m/e |
30/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
71C |
Dorchester |
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/01/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1622 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31622 |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (71C) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31622 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|