31/12/1947 |
Exmouth Junction MPD |
'D.1' No. 701S (ex 2284) is now here. No. 1625, the oil-burning 'U' 'Mogul,' is working from here, the crews receiving tuition from an instructional team from Eastleigh. |
SLS/194802 |
31/08/1950 |
Chessington Zoo excursions |
On 23rd and 30th August, 1950, through excursions were run from Maidenhead and/or High Wycombe to Chessington South, for the Zoo. Passengers were, of course, mostly juveniles. The route was via the West London Line, Clapham Jc., East Putney, Wimbledon and Motspur Park. The second of these was hauled to Kensington by 2-6-2T No. 6123, and thence by U.2-6-0 No. 31625. The load was nine coaches of W.R. stock, with more than half the seats occupied despite the mid-week date. Considerable amazement was caused by the passage of this train down the purely suburban electrified Chessington branch. |
SLS/195101 |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
10/04/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. |
SLS/196505 |
05/09/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. |
SLS/196510 |
06/02/1966 |
Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry |
5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. |
SLS/196603 |
16/10/1967 |
Barry Works |
Dumped locomotives - behind the works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5637, 5643, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 42765, 48431, 45690, 53809, 71000, 75014, 92134. Total :58. |
SLS/196712 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |