Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1156 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18959 Week
» 71975 Month
» 191502 Year
» 3218355 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1636 |
m/e |
04/1931 |
British Railways |
31636 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 04/1931 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 09/06/1963 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1636 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31636 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31636 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|