Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1426 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19229 Week
» 72245 Month
» 191772 Year
» 3218625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1660 |
m/e |
09/1891 |
British Railways |
31660 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Bob Tails |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 09/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1953 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1660 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31660 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
12/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31660 |
|
|
04/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|