Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2286 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20089 Week
» 73105 Month
» 192632 Year
» 3219485 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1663 |
m/e |
10/1891 |
British Railways |
31663 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Bob Tails |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 10/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1953 |
Service Life |
61 yrs , 9 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1891 |
GIL |
|
Gillingham (Kent) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
73E |
|
Faversham |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
07/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73E |
Faversham |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
73C |
Hither Green |
2w/e |
10/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/06/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/12/1951 |
Brighton Works |
The last new tank for 1951 is No. 80025, due by 20/12. No. s2060 is being scrapped, and 0-4-2T 701S will shortly follow. No. 32021 was still waiting scrapping during the latter part of December. Among engines under repair is Kirtley 0-4-4T No. 31663, still bearing Sharp Stewart & Co. plates 3727/1891 (old L.C. & D.R. No. 204). |
SLS/195202 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1663 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31663 |
|
|
1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
07/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31663 |
|
|