Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1690 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
British Railways |
31690 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/06/1962 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
73F |
Ashford |
4w/e |
09/11/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
75D |
Stewarts Lane |
w/e |
25/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1690 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31690 |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31690 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|