Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1540 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20451 Week
» 85405 Month
» 288069 Year
» 3314922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1696 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
British Railways |
31696 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
R1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1951 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/03/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. |
SLS/195104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1696 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31696 |
|
|
03/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31696 |
|
|