Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1634 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15040 Week
» 68056 Month
» 187583 Year
» 3214436 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1704 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
British Railways |
31704 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
R1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/04/1956 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1900 |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
73E |
|
Faversham |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
74D |
|
Tonbridge |
6w/e |
27/03/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/04/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73E |
Faversham |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
74D |
Tonbridge |
3w/e |
27/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1704 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31704 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
27/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
14/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31704 |
|
|
05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|