Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 777 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6177 Week
» 24229 Month
» 257149 Year
» 1922525 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1729 m/e 03/1901
British Railways 31729 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 03/1901
Withdrawal During 05/1954
Service Life 53 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1954

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1901
RED   Redhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 03/05/1949
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 09/09/1950
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 05/02/1951
74D   Tonbridge 9w/e 30/06/1952
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GIL Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 03/05/1949
REINS 73D Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 8w/e 05/02/1951
WDN   on 24/04/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1729
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31729    
03/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
05/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 31729    
07/1954 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev