Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18170 Week
» 71186 Month
» 190713 Year
» 3217566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1740 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
British Railways |
31740 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
Coppernobs |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1951 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1901 |
STL |
|
St Leonards |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
23/09/1945 |
Eastern Section |
Schools Class 930 (BAS) has been working on the Eastern Section at least since 23/9 when she worked to Hastings. She has a high sided self-trimming tender. Class C 1480 has been transferred from STL, where D class 1488 has joined 1075, 1740/4, the latter being shown as Class D1 in error in the allocation published in the November Journal. B1 1021, 1440/55/7 are TON. |
SLS/194602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1740 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 31740 but not taken up |
|
|
1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1740 |
|
|