Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1122 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14528 Week
» 67544 Month
» 187071 Year
» 3213924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1741 |
m/e |
03/1903 |
British Railways |
31741 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 03/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1741 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31741 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31741 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|