Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1276 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14682 Week
» 67698 Month
» 187225 Year
» 3214078 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1746 |
m/e |
07/1903 |
British Railways |
31746 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
Coppernobs |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 07/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 11/12/1954 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1746 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31746 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31746 |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|