Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 401 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18204 Week
» 71220 Month
» 190747 Year
» 3217600 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1749 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
British Railways |
31749 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 10/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/11/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1749 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31749 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31749 |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|