Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 117 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17920 Week
» 70936 Month
» 190463 Year
» 3217316 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1768 |
m/e |
09/1914 |
British Railways |
31768 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
German Engines |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 09/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/12/1961 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1961 |
Last Maunsell ex-S.E.C.R. Class L condemned |
The last Maunsell ex-S.E.C.R. Class L 4-4-0 loco. 31768 of Nine Elms (70A) was condemned last December. Constructed by Beyer, Peacock & Co. as S.E.C.R. 768 in September, 1914, bearing Maker's No. 5832, it was renumbered S.R. A768 in July, 1924, 1768 during March, 1932, and B.R. 31768 in December, 1948. The class of twenty-two locos. passed into B.R. ownership and withdrawals began with 31769 in April, 1956. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1768 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31768 |
|
|
30/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
13/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
19/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
12/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31768 |
|
|