Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1004 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15047 Week
» 80001 Month
» 282665 Year
» 3309518 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1787 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
British Railways |
31787 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/03/1955 |
Easter Holiday arrangements |
Passenger engines, other than 30736, 30774, 31787, 34087 an 34101, will be withdrawn from store as required for Easter Holiday special traffic and returned to store afterwards. |
SLS/195504 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1787 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31787 |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
11/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31787 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|